OR HB4066 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 76, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 76, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court to establish reasonable fees for use of Oregon Judicial Case Information Network. Repeals sunset on increases in certain filing fees, fees for writs of garnishment and marriage solemnization fees. Repeals sunset on provisions directing State Court Administrator to transfer to State Court Technology Fund certain percentage of fees paid to court. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to funds supporting court technology; declaring an emergency; and providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Chapter 76, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014. |
2014-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--George; excused, 1--Starr. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-03-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Fagan, Freeman, Gallegos, Gilliam, Hanna, Krieger, McLane, Sprenger, Thatcher, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. |
2014-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |