OR HB4081 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 8, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 8, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies acts and practices of charitable organizations that are violations of law . Specifies acts and practices of charitable organizations that are violations of law and unlawful trade practices . Authorizes Attorney General to take corrective actions and impose penalties for specified violations of law by charitable organizations. Increases amount of penalty that can be imposed for failure to pay fees or file timely annual report.
Title
Relating to regulation of charitable organizations; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 8, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015. |
2014-03-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Close, Ferrioli, George, Hansell, Knopp, Olsen, Shields, Starr, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed.Ayes, 57; Absent, 1--Conger; Excused, 2--Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 14, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-12 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |