OR HB4097 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The Act changes the process for setting aside offense convictions and dismissals and contempt findings. The Act makes some of the same changes for setting aside GEI judgments. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.7). [Digest: The Act changes the process for setting aside offense convictions and dismissals. The Act makes the same changes for setting aside GEI judgments. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.7).] Modifies the process for setting aside convictions, dismissals, contempt of court findings and guilty except for insanity judgments. Increases waiting period for setting aside certain types of contempt of court findings. Modifies when the court is required to hold a hearing on and grant motions to set aside. Requires that the court enter an order within [60] 120 days of granting a motion to set aside. [Authorizes the court to waive remaining fines and fees upon entry of the order.] Specifies a process for when a person has outstanding financial obligations and authorizes the court to waive such obligations under specified circumstances. Provides that the required time period prior to filing the motion, during which the person is required to have no convictions, applies to motions to set aside convictions and certain arrests, charges and citations only. Provides that the dismissal of a traffic violation citation may not be set aside. Directs the Judicial Department to annually submit a report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary concerning motions to set aside.
Title
Relating to expungements.
Sponsors
Rep. Thuy Tran [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Travis Nelson [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2024-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2024-02-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2024-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |