OR HB4105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state agencies from authorizing construction of new infrastructure for exploration, development or production of oil or gas on state-owned real property or for transportation of oil or gas across state-owned real property. Requires facilities unloading oil or gas received by rail to provide advance notice to Department of Transportation. Prohibits facilities from loading or unloading oil or gas with vapor pressure of nine pounds per square inch or more. Delays operative date based on annual volume of oil and gas transported by rail. Imposes maximum penalty of $2,500 per day per railcar for facility violations. Directs department to transmit information received from facilities to office of State Fire Marshal. Requires State Fire Marshal to consider information in developing oil and hazardous materials spill response plan.
Title
Relating to fossil fuels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4105 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4105/Introduced |