OR HB5004 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 573, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 573, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Corrections for certain biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Corrections; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 573, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 2--Johnson, Olsen; excused, 3--Monroe, Roblan, Thomsen. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Carried over to 06-30 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Kennemer; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-13 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2017-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |