OR HB5015 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 558, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 558, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Bureau of Labor and Industries for biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Bureau of Labor and Industries for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by bureau. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau from Wage Security Fund. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau from federal funds. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau of certain lottery funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Bureau of Labor and Industries; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 558, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Findley, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Clem; Excused, 1--Noble. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |