OR HB5032 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 382, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 382, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Public Utility Commission of Oregon. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Public Utility Commission of Oregon. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Public Utility Commission of Oregon; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 382, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Cate, Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |