OR HCR11 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honors Ramona Line for decades of service as Chief Clerk of Oregon House of Representatives.
Title
Honoring Ramona Line for decades of service as Chief Clerk of Oregon House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-29 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Boquist, Rosenbaum. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Taken from 04-21 Calendar and placed on 04-27 Calendar on voice vote. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-02 | House | Read. Carried by Buckley, Olson. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Gorsek. |
2015-02-20 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 2, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |