OR HCR14 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting Code of West as model of conduct in State of Oregon.
Title
Adopting Code of West as model of conduct in State of Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-04-05 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-29 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-03-28 | Read. Carried by Freeman. Adopted. Ayes, 44; Nays, 14--Berger, Beyer, Cannon, Cowan, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Hoyle, Matthews, Nolan, Tomei, Witt; Excused, 2--Boone, Weidner. | |
2011-03-24 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-03-21 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-02-16 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hcr1.dir/hcr0014.intro.html |