OR HCR14 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes name of Silver Creek Heritage Grove in Elliott State Forest to Jerry Phillips Reserve.
Title
Changing name of Silver Creek Heritage Grove in Elliott State Forest to Jerry Phillips Reserve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from 05-13 Calendar and placed on 05-20 Calendar by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Taken from 05-06 Calendar and placed on 05-13 Calendar on voice vote. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-20 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by McKeown. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--McLain, McLane, Witt. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 20, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-11 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-03-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |