OR HJM16 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to refrain from imposing mandates on states and to allow State of Oregon to freely exercise sovereignty granted to it under Tenth Amendment of Constitution of United States.
Title
Urging Congress to refrain from imposing mandates on states and to allow State of Oregon to freely exercise sovereignty granted to it under Tenth Amendment of Constitution of United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-03-11 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hjm1.dir/hjm0016.intro.html |