OR HJM6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to take steps to ease shortage of primary care physicians in Oregon. Urges Congress to take steps to ease shortage of primary care physicians in Oregon.
Title
Urging Congress to take steps to ease shortage of primary care physicians in Oregon.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Committee Be adopted as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Committee Be adopted as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Thatcher, excused when roll called, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-05 | House | Read. Carried by Lively. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2015-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-03-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |