OR HJR11 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution providing for same-day voter registration. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution providing for same-day voter registration. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to same day voter registration
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HJR11 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HJR11/Introduced |