OR HJR21 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution that provides that rate of ad valorem property taxes imposed by county for any property tax year may not be less than $2.00 per thousand dollars of assessed value and excepts $2.00 per thousand dollars minimum from compression under Ballot Measure 5 (1990). Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next primary election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to the property tax rates of counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, refer to Rules by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to Rules by prior reference. |
2015-06-12 | House | Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules by prior reference. |
2015-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |