OR HR1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Janice Scroggins, 1955-2014.
Title
In memoriam: Janice Scroggins, 1955-2014.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. William Shields [D] | Rep. Peter Buckley [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Rep. Barbara Warner [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-03-31 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-03-26 | House | Read. Carried by Frederick. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Davis, Gilliam. |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 26, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-16 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-03-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |