OR SB143 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for tax credit for rural medical care. Extends sunset for tax credit for rural medical care.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for rural medical care.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Tax Expenditures. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |