OR SB1506 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to mental health drugs; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to mental health drugs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Effective date, March 16, 2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Chapter 51, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-28 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gelser. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-27 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Winters. | |
2012-02-25 | Carried over to 02-27 by unanimous consent. | |
2012-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2012-02-22 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-17 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-13 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-10 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-08 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy, then Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |