OR SB1507 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective date, March 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective date, March 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to HIV testing; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to HIV testing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Effective date, March 5, 2012. | |
2012-03-13 | Chapter 26, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-05 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-24 | President signed. | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading. Carried by Doherty, Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2012-02-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-09 | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-08 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-07 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-06 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Informational Meeting scheduled. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |