OR SB1532 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, June 4, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption of property in enterprise zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to the exemption of property in enterprise zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Effective date, June 4, 2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Chapter 103, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-24 | President signed. | |
2012-02-22 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G. | |
2012-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hunt. | |
2012-02-21 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 22, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2012-02-16 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-15 | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-14 | Carried over to 02-15 by unanimous consent. | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-10 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |