OR SB1544 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to adopt by rule additional minimum standards regarding source of tuition revenue for licensing of career schools and schools authorized to confer degrees. Establishes penalty for violation of standards as Class B misdemeanor and civil penalty.
Title
Relating to regulation of post-secondary institutions of education.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |