OR SB1550 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Effective date, April 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Effective date, April 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers Office of Immigrant and Refugee Advancement from office of Governor to Department of Human Services. Transfers Office of Immigrant and Refugee Advancement from office of Governor to Department of Human Services. Becomes operative 91 days after effective date of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Office of Immigrant and Refugee Advancement; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Effective date, April 15, 2022. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 118, 2022 Laws. |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hieb, Lewis, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 1--Boshart Davis; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Zika. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 4--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 4--Beyer, Boquist, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |