OR SB1552 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-7)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-7)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective date, April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to foreclosures of residential trust deeds; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to foreclosures of residential trust deeds; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Effective date, April 11, 2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Chapter 112, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-21 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Ferrioli, Kruse, Whitsett. | |
2012-03-05 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Conger, Wand. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey, Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Smith G.. | |
2012-03-05 | Second reading. | |
2012-03-05 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2012-03-05 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Rules by default in compliance with House Rule 9.01 (2). | |
2012-02-17 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-16 | Beyer, Boquist, President Courtney declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2012-02-16 | Third reading. Carried by Beyer, Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Ferrioli, Kruse, Nelson, Whitsett. | |
2012-02-15 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-13 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |