OR SB1562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-22)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-22)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person commits crime of strangulation if person knowingly impedes normal breathing or circulation of another person by applying pressure to chest of other person. Increases penalty for crime of strangulation when victim is family or household member. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to classify felony strangulation as crime category 5 if committed against family or household member.
Title
Relating to strangulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2019. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 84, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Salinas, Stark. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Kennemer. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Riley. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |