OR SB1573 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Effective date, March 15, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Effective date, March 15, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires city whose laws require petition proposing annexation of territory to be submitted to electors to annex territory without vote upon receipt of petition for annexation submitted by all owners of land in territory provided territory is included within urban growth boundary of city or Metro and is, or will be, subject to acknowledged comprehensive plan of city, at least one parcel in territory is contiguous to city limits and proposal conforms to all other requirements of city's ordinances Requires city whose laws require petition proposing annexation of territory to be submitted to electors to annex territory without vote upon receipt of petition for annexation submitted by all owners of land in territory provided territory is included within urban growth boundary of city or Metro and is, or will be, subject to acknowledged comprehensive plan of city, at least one parcel in territory is contiguous to city limits and proposal conforms to all other requirements of city's ordinances. Provides that territory to be annexed includes additional territory necessary to provide] locate infrastructure and right of way access for services necessary for development of annexed territory at density planned in acknowledged comprehensive plan] equal to average residential density within annexing city. Provides city is not required to hold public hearing and] may declare territory annexed by ordinance containing description of territory. Validates designated urban reserve adopted by Metro and Clackamas County.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to boundary changes; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Effective date, March 15, 2016. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Chapter 051, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed.Ayes, 32; Nays, 28--Barton, Boone, Clem, Davis, Evans, Fagan, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Hack, Holvey, Hoyle, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Olson, Parrish, Piluso, Post, Rayfield, Stark, Taylor, Wilson. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Edwards, Monnes Anderson. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Devlin, Gelser, Girod, Hansell, Monnes Anderson, Riley, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, President Courtney; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Carried over to 03-01 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |