OR SB1595 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Effective date, April 4, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Effective date, April 4, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Act increases some amounts that are protected from debt collectors. The Act changes some laws about bad debt collection methods. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2). Increases certain exemptions from garnishment and execution. Modifies provisions relating to unfair debt collection practices. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to protections from debt collection; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2024. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 100, 2024 Laws. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sosa. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 9--Boice, Cate, Goodwin, Levy B, McIntire, Reschke, Smith G, Stout, Yunker; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Cramer, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Hieb, Ruiz. |
2024-03-05 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 8--Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President, then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue and then Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business, then Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |