OR SB222 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Accelerated Learning Committee.
Title
Relating to accelerated college credit programs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 761, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |