OR SB434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grants higher property tax exemption for property of veterans with service-connected disabilities of 100 percent or more. Grants higher property tax exemption for property of veterans with service-connected disabilities of 100 percent or more. Grants exemption for surviving spouse of veteran who remains unmarried. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the taxation of property of disabled veterans; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Finance and Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |