OR SB446 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for annual adjustment of judges' salaries based on Consumer Price Index.
Title
Relating to judges' salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |