OR SCR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Patrick James Simpson, 1940-2019. In memoriam: Patrick James Simpson, 1940-2019.
Title
In memoriam: Patrick James Simpson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-06-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Boquist, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Heard, Johnson, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules carried by voice vote. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |