OR SCR205 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memoriam: Betty Roberts, 1923-2011.
Title
In memoriam: Betty Roberts, 1923-2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2012-02-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-28 | President signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Read. Carried by Nolan. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Jenson. | |
2012-02-24 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 27, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-23 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 24, 2012 Calendar. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-21 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-17 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-16 | Final reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-16 | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. | |
2012-02-07 | Taken from 02-07 Calendar and placed on 02-16 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2012-02-06 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-06 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-03 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |