OR SCR25 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes limitations and deadlines for legislative measures for 2022 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly. Establishes limitations and deadlines for legislative measures for 2022 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly. Provides that certain labor negotiations are not legislative deliberations and are to be conducted under executive session.
Title
Establishing limitations and deadlines for legislative measures for the 2022 regular session of the Eighty-first Legislative Assembly, and providing certain labor negotiation procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments to the A-Eng measure. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments to the A-Eng measure. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2021-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Taylor, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 4--Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Smith Warner. Adopted. Ayes, 36; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Weber, Wilde, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Hayden, Moore-Green, Morgan, Smith G. |
2021-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-06-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Kennemer; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Possible Reconsideration and Work Session cancelled. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |