PA HB116 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-03-29 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-03-29 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 21, 1949 (P.L.665, No.155), known as the First Class City Home Rule Act, further providing for the general grant of power.
Title
An Act amending the act of April 21, 1949 (P.L.665, No.155), known as the First Class City Home Rule Act, further providing for the general grant of power.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-03-29 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-03-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-03-19 | Second consideration | |
2007-03-19 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-03-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-13 | Removed from table | |
2007-03-12 | Laid on the table | |
2007-03-12 | First consideration | |
2007-03-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=116 |