PA HB136 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-12)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-01 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-01 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 31, 1945 (P.L.1198, No.418), known as the Surface Mining Conservation and Reclamation Act, further providing for mining permit; providing for bioenergy crop bonding; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for mining permit; providing for bioenergy crop bonding; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-01 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-31 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-31 | First consideration | |
2009-03-31 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |