PA HB1516 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Title
In riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1516 PN 3869, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09610 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1516 PN 3869, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09610 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-10-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2016-10-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-17 | House | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-20 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |