PA HB1574 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-17)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-17)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 15, 1986 (P.L.1595, No.175), known as the Antihazing Law, further providing for definitions and for enforcement.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1574 PN 3016, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1574 PN 3016, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1574 PN 2268, FP (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1574 PN 2268, 2015 A4133, SUSP RULES, MURT (Y: 107 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1574 PN 3016, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1574 PN 3016, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1574 PN 2268, FP (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1574 PN 2268, 2015 A4133, SUSP RULES, MURT (Y: 107 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | House | Act No. 31 |
2016-05-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed in House |
2016-05-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (180-15) |
2016-05-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-05-16 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-05-09 | House | In the House |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2015-11-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-3) |
2015-11-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-16 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-12 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-10 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-09-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |