PA HB1781 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for contraband prohibited.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, further providing for contraband prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1781 PN 2371, FP (Y: 156 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1781 PN 2371, FP (Y: 156 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (156-40) |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-16 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-08-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |