PA HB1908 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the definition of "fire department vehicle."
Title
Further providing for the definition of "fire department vehicle."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-13 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-29 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-29 | First consideration | |
2010-06-29 | Reported as committed | |
2009-08-06 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |