PA HB204 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for the tourism marketing and promotion tax credit.
Title
Providing for the tourism marketing and promotion tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A01191 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A00431 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A00431 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A01191 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A01191 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A00431 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A00431 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A01191 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |