PA HB2042 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 23, 1970 (P.L.563, No.195), known as the Public Employe Relations Act, further providing for definitions; in employee rights, providing for payments to employee organizations; and making related repeals.
Title
Further providing for definitions; in employee rights, providing for payments to employee organizations; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-03 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |