PA HB2049 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for public venue license.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for public venue license.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Torren Ecker [R] | Rep. Milou Mackenzie [R] |
Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Jason Ortitay [R] | Rep. Jason Silvis [R] | Rep. Brian Smith [R] |
Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2049 PN 3276, FP (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2049 PN 2358, 2021 A4790 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2049 PN 3276, FP (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2049 PN 2358, 2021 A4790 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-1) |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-14 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-04 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |