PA HB2075 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rates and distribution systems, further providing for valuation of and return on the property of a public utility.
Title
In rates and distribution systems, further providing for valuation of and return on the property of a public utility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2075 PN 4249, CONCUR (Y: 177 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2075 PN 4249, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2075 PN 3776, FP (Y: 181 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07793 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2075 PN 4249, CONCUR (Y: 177 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2075 PN 4249, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2075 PN 3776, FP (Y: 181 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07793 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 120 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (177-10) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-16 | House | In the House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (181-14) |
2018-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-22 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |