PA HB2078 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, further providing for issuing permanent college certificates, for program of continuing professional education and for professional educator discipline fee.
Title
In certification of teachers, further providing for issuing permanent college certificates, for program of continuing professional education and for professional educator discipline fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2078 PN 3452, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3452, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3452, MOT PROCEED, REED (Y: 174 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3395, 2015 A7771, PHILLIPS-HILL (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07530 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3452, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3452, MOT PROCEED, REED (Y: 174 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3395, 2015 A7771, PHILLIPS-HILL (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07530 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 143 |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2016-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-0) |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-06 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |