PA HB2078 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 2A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 2A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Title
Making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2078 PN 3746, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3746, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A07641 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2078 PN 3746, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A07641 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Act No. 2A |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-2) |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-17 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-11 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |