PA HB2134 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in crime victims, further providing for rights; in administration, further providing for office and for powers and duties of victim advocate; and, in financial matters, further providing for costs.
Title
In crime victims, further providing for rights; in administration, further providing for office and for powers and duties of victim advocate; and, in financial matters, further providing for costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-09-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-09-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (174-15) |
2014-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |