PA HB2282 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 4A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 4A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Small Business Advocate in the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Title
Making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Small Business Advocate in the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 4A |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |