PA HB2289 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge that crosses over the Frankstown Branch of the Juniata River on State Route 2015, also known as Yellow Springs Drive, in Catharine Township and Williamsburg Borough, Blair County, as the Williamsburg Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge that crosses over the Frankstown Branch of the Juniata River on State Route 2015, also known as Yellow Springs Drive, in Catharine Township and Williamsburg Borough, Blair County, as the Williamsburg Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - HB 2289 PN 3311, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2012-05-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2012-05-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-22 | House | Second consideration |
2012-05-21 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |