PA HB2307 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for victim and witness outreach; and, in post-trial matters, further providing for eligibility for relief and for jurisdiction and proceedings.
Title
Providing for victim and witness outreach; and, in post-trial matters, further providing for eligibility for relief and for jurisdiction and proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2307 PN 4067, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09325 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2307 PN 4067, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09325 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-10-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2018-10-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-09 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |