PA HB2314 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fiscal affairs, further providing for establishment and use of Game Fund and for appropriation and audit of moneys.
Title
In fiscal affairs, further providing for establishment and use of Game Fund and for appropriation and audit of moneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4866 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4841 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4837 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4832 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4818 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-22 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4866 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4841 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4837 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4832 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2314 PN 3151, 2023 A4818 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-22 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2024-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2024-05-22 | House | Validity of Committee Report Sustained (102-100) |
2024-05-22 | House | Motion to Object to Committee Report |
2024-05-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |