PA HB2319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for return of registration plate, for person with disability plate and placard and for special plates for recipients of Purple Heart; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for return of registration plate, for person with disability plate and placard and for special plates for recipients of Purple Heart; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2319 PN 3664, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05228 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2319 PN 3664, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05228 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-25 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-05-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-05 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |