PA HB2363 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for the definition of "income."
Title
In senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for the definition of "income."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-22 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to FINANCE |